PA HB580 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-09 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-09 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal police education and training, further defining "police department" and "police officer"; and further providing for reimbursement of expenses and for payment of certain county costs.
Title
In municipal police education and training, further defining "police department" and "police officer"; and further providing for reimbursement of expenses and for payment of certain county costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-02 - House - HB 580 PN 2367, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - House - HB 580 PN 637, 2009 A2204, PALLONE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-01 - House - HB 580 PN 637, 2009 A2204, PALLONE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-09 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE | |
2009-07-02 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-01 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-06-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-17 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-17 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-17 | First consideration | |
2009-03-17 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to JUDICIARY |