PA HB577 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 29, 1945 (P.L.1134, No.405), entitled "An act to create a commission to act jointly with commissions appointed for like purpose by the States of West Virginia and Maryland, the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia, which, together with three members to be appointed by the President of the United States, shall constitute the Interstate Commission on the Potomac River Basin, with power to cooperate in the abatement of the existing pollution, and in the control of future pollution of the waters of the drainage basin of the Potomac River within the States of Maryland and West Virginia, the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia; to authorize the Governor of the State to execute on behalf of this State a compact with representatives of other states for the purpose of forming the above-mentioned commission; and creating a Potomac Valley Conservancy District; providing for the appointment of the Pennsylvania members of said commission for the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and their terms of office; and providing an appropriation," further providing for membership of commission and for appointments.
Title
Amending the act of May 29, 1945 (P.L.1134, No.405), entitled "An act to create a commission to act jointly with commissions appointed for like purpose by the States of West Virginia and Maryland, the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia, which, together with three members to be appointed by the President of the United States, shall constitute the Interstate Commission on the Potomac River Basin, with power to cooperate in the abatement of the existing pollution, and in the control of future pollution of the waters of the drainage basin of the Potomac River within the States of Maryland and West Virginia, the Commonwealth of Virginia and the District of Columbia; to authorize the Governor of the State to execute on behalf of this State a compact with representatives of other states for the purpose of forming the above-mentioned commission; and creating a Potomac Valley Conservancy District; providing for the appointment of the Pennsylvania members of said commission for the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, and their terms of office; and providing an appropriation," further providing for membership of commission and for appointments.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Mark Cohen [D] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] | Rep. Matthew Gabler [R] | Rep. Michael Driscoll [D] | Rep. Thomas Murt [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 577 PN 646, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 577 PN 646, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-07-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2016-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-22 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-21 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |