PA HB538 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for prohibiting use of hearing impairment devices.
Title
In rules of the road in general, further providing for prohibiting use of hearing impairment devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 538 PN 511, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 198 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 538 PN 511, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 198 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-11-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2024-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-16 | House | Second consideration |
2024-04-15 | House | Removed from table |
2023-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-11-14 | House | First consideration |
2023-11-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |