PA HB528 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-15 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act requiring certain long-term care facilities to coordinate with licensing agencies and local area agencies on aging to provide assistance to consumers in circumstances involving relocation of consumers; and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Aging.
Title
Requiring certain long-term care facilities to coordinate with licensing agencies and local area agencies on aging to provide assistance to consumers in circumstances involving relocation of consumers; and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Aging.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - House - HB 528 PN 3725, FP (Y: 196 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - HB 528 PN 3669, 2011 A11606, DELISSIO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - HB 528 PN 3669, 2011 A11606, DELISSIO (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2012-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2012-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-2) |
2012-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-06-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2012-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-08 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |