PA HB521 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-20 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for sentence of total confinement; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for the offense of driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked and for ignition interlock limited license; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for ignition interlock, for prior offenses, for Accelerated Rehabilitative Disposition, for drug and alcohol assessments and for mandatory sentencing and providing for substance monitoring program.
Title
In sentencing, further providing for sentence of total confinement; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in licensing of drivers, further providing for the offense of driving while operating privilege is suspended or revoked and for ignition interlock limited license; and, in driving after imbibing alcohol or utilizing drugs, further providing for ignition interlock, for prior offenses, for Accelerated Rehabilitative Disposition, for drug and alcohol assessments and for mandatory sentencing and providing for substance monitoring program.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Stephens [R] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Wendi Thomas [R] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] |
Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05509 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1143, FP (Y: 143 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1143, MOT CONST, MILLER, D. (Y: 138 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1020, 2021 A605, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1020, 2021 A600, KLUNK (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00509 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1143, FP (Y: 143 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1143, MOT CONST, MILLER, D. (Y: 138 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1020, 2021 A605, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 521 PN 1020, 2021 A600, KLUNK (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00509 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-04-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-04-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (143-58) |
2021-04-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-04-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-04-05 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-23 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |