PA HB508 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 5, 1936 (2nd Sp.Sess., 1937 P.L.2897, No.1), known as the Unemployment Compensation Law, establishing the Back-to-Work Bonus Program; and making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Back-to-Work Bonus Program; and making an appropriation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 508 PN 1562, 2021 A1512, APPEAL CHAIR, HARRIS (Y: 113 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 508 PN 1562, 2021 A1462, KAUFER (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-09HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-06-08HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-26HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-26HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-26HouseReported as committed
2021-05-19HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=508
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0508&pn=1562
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0508&pn=1749
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=05/25/2021&RollCallId=492
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=307
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=308

Bill Comments 750

feedback