PA HB504 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-20 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in tax for education, further providing for sales and use tax for timbering; establishing the School District Millage Rate Reduction Fund and the School District Homestead and Farmstead Relief Fund; providing for additional taxation and for senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance; and repealing provisions of the Taxpayer Relief Act.
Title
In tax for education, further providing for sales and use tax for timbering; establishing the School District Millage Rate Reduction Fund and the School District Homestead and Farmstead Relief Fund; providing for additional taxation and for senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance; and repealing provisions of the Taxpayer Relief Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 1560, FP (Y: 105 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 1560, 2015 A1630, SUSP RULES, DIAMOND (Y: 81 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1241, HARPER (Y: 26 N: 167 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A840, EVANKOVICH (Y: 34 N: 159 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1263, KELLER, F. (Y: 13 N: 180 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1254, KELLER, F. (Y: 15 N: 178 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1559, KNOWLES (Y: 58 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1564, SAYLOR (Y: 109 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 1560, FP (Y: 105 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 1560, 2015 A1630, SUSP RULES, DIAMOND (Y: 81 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1241, HARPER (Y: 26 N: 167 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A840, EVANKOVICH (Y: 34 N: 159 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1263, KELLER, F. (Y: 13 N: 180 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1254, KELLER, F. (Y: 15 N: 178 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1559, KNOWLES (Y: 58 N: 135 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-12 - House - House Floor: HB 504 PN 561, 2015 A1564, SAYLOR (Y: 109 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2015-05-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-05-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (105-86) |
2015-05-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-05-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-05-12 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-04-22 | House | Removed from table |
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-04-21 | House | First consideration |
2015-04-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to FINANCE |