PA HB489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving indecent exposure when children present.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sentencing, providing for sentencing for offenses involving indecent exposure when children present.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House Floor: HB 489 PN 513, FP (Y: 182 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-04-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (182-10)
2017-04-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-19HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-04HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-04HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-04HouseReported as committed
2017-02-14HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback