PA HB489 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-12 - Removed from table

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.893, No.141), known as the Volunteer Health Services Act, further providing for license renewal, continuing education requirements and disciplinary and corrective measures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.893, No.141), known as the Volunteer Health Services Act, further providing for license renewal, continuing education requirements and disciplinary and corrective measures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-11-12 Removed from table
2008-06-10 Laid on the table
2008-06-09 Removed from table
2008-06-09 Laid on the table
2008-03-31 Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill dropped from calendar
2008-03-31 Reported as amended, (House Rules Committee reverted to Printer's Number 1992)
2008-03-12 Resolution to discharge committee from further consideration of this bill presented
2008-01-14 Referred to RULES
2007-12-11 Third consideration and final passage
2007-12-10 Second consideration
2007-12-10 Re-reported as amended
2007-11-13 Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2007-10-30 First consideration
2007-10-30 Reported as committed
2007-07-08 Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2007-07-06 Third consideration and final passage
2007-07-06 Re-reported as committed
2007-07-05 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2007-07-05 Second consideration
2007-07-05 Re-reported as committed
2007-06-20 Re-committed to RULES
2007-06-20 First consideration
2007-06-20 Reported as amended
2007-02-26 Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback