PA HB482 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-10 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act limiting assignment of State-owned vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting assignment of State-owned vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-01 - House - House Floor: HB 482 PN 3474, FP (Y: 140 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 482 PN 3474, 2017 A9183, DAVIDSON (Y: 4 N: 190 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A06953 (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-10SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2018-10-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (140-44)
2018-10-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25HouseSecond consideration
2018-09-13HouseRemoved from table
2018-06-22HouseLaid on the table
2018-06-22HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-01HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-01HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-01HouseReported as amended
2017-02-14HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=482
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0482&pn=0506
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0482&pn=3474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1479
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1489
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1472
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1496
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/01/2018&RollCallId=1976

Bill Comments

feedback