PA HB46 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-31 - Act No. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, codifying the act of July 2, 2006 (P.L.292, No.65), known as the Organ and Bone Marrow Donor Act; further providing for applicability; and making a related repeal.
Title
Codifying the act of July 2, 2006 (P.L.292, No.65), known as the Organ and Bone Marrow Donor Act; further providing for applicability; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - HB 46 PN 31, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - HB 46 PN 31, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Act No. 193 |
2014-10-31 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-23 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-22 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-05-01 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2013-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2013-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2013-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2013-01-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-01-22 | House | First consideration |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-09 | House | Referred to FINANCE |