PA HB45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Act No. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the use of investigational drugs, biological products and medical devices by terminally ill patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the use of investigational drugs, biological products and medical devices by terminally ill patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 45 PN 2108, CONCUR (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-03 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 45 PN 2108, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Floor: HB 45 PN 1264, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 45 PN 1051, 2017 A694, GODSHALL (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A00415 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11HouseAct No. 33
2017-10-11HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-10-05HousePresented to the Governor
2017-10-04HouseSigned in Senate
2017-10-04HouseSigned in House
2017-10-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (198-0)
2017-10-03HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-10-03HouseReferred to RULES
2017-10-02HouseIn the House
2017-10-02SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-07-26SenateRemoved from table
2017-07-17SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-30SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-21SenateReported as amended
2017-04-20SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-04-18SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2017-04-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-04-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-03-22HouseLaid on the table
2017-03-22HouseFirst consideration
2017-03-22HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=45
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0045&pn=0051
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0045&pn=1051
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0045&pn=1264
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0045&pn=2108
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=56&theDate=03/22/2017&RollCallId=127
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=153
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=171
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/18/2017&RollCallId=237
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=327
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=276
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/03/2017&RollCallId=951
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=736

Bill Comments

feedback