PA HB440 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-9)
Status: Passed on October 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-29 - Act No. 83
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in criminal history record information, further providing for expungement, for petition for limited access, for clean slate limited access and for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access; and, in administration of justice, further providing for attachment and summary punishment for contempts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In criminal history record information, further providing for expungement, for petition for limited access, for clean slate limited access and for effects of expunged records and records subject to limited access; and, in administration of justice, further providing for attachment and summary punishment for contempts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 440 PN 4546, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - House - House Floor: HB 440 PN 4546, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-18 - House - House Floor: HB 440 PN 3054, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 440 PN 3004, 2019 A4277, KAUFFMAN (Y: 169 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 440 PN 3004, 2019 A4277, SUSP RULES, KAUFFMAN (Y: 162 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 440 PN 3004, 2019 A4375, STEPHENS (Y: 175 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 440 PN 3004, 2019 A4228, NESBIT (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-10 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04172 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04172 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-29HouseAct No. 83
2020-10-29HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-10-22HousePresented to the Governor
2020-10-21HouseSigned in Senate
2020-10-21HouseSigned in House
2020-10-21HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2020-10-21HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-10-21HouseReferred to RULES
2020-10-21HouseIn the House
2020-10-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2020-10-20SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-10-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-19SenateSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-09-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-09-22SenateReported as committed
2020-06-24SenateCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4018
2019-12-26SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-12-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-12-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-0)
2019-12-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-12-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-12-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-12-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-12-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-09HouseFirst consideration
2019-12-09HouseReported as amended
2019-02-11HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=440
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0440&pn=0426
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0440&pn=3004
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0440&pn=3054
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0440&pn=4018
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0440&pn=4546
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/10/2019&RollCallId=1475
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=976
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=977
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=978
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=996
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/18/2019&RollCallId=1562
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1474
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/09/2019&RollCallId=1475
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=09/22/2020&RollCallId=1151
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/20/2020&RollCallId=1246
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1717
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=694
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/21/2020&RollCallId=2586

Bill Comments

feedback