PA HB435 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-7)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-7)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse, for reporting procedure, for confidentiality of reports, for release of information in confidential reports, for information relating to prospective child-care personnel, for information relating to family day-care home residents and for information relating to other persons having contact with children; providing for continued employment or participation in program, activity or service and for certification compliance; making a conforming amendment to Title 42; providing for a study on employment bans for those having contact with children; and making editorial changes.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse, for reporting procedure, for confidentiality of reports, for release of information in confidential reports, for information relating to prospective child-care personnel, for information relating to family day-care home residents and for information relating to other persons having contact with children; providing for continued employment or participation in program, activity or service and for certification compliance; making a conforming amendment to Title 42; providing for a study on employment bans for those having contact with children; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-08 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 435 PN 2010, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - House - HB 435 PN 2010, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 153 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-15 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-14 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (175-18) |
2014-10-14 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-14 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2013-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-20 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |