PA HB430 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 25, 1945 (P.L.1050, No.394), known as the Local Tax Collection Law, further providing for effect of failure to receive tax notice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for effect of failure to receive tax notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Adopt Amendment A02562 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Floor: HB 430 PN 1322, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 430 PN 407, 2021 A662, N. NELSON (Y: 194 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-25SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-10-25SenateSecond consideration
2021-10-19SenateFirst consideration
2021-10-19SenateReported as amended
2021-05-04SenateReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
2021-04-21SenateIn the Senate
2021-04-21HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-1)
2021-04-21HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-04-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-20HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-04-06HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-24HouseReported as committed
2021-02-08HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=430
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0430&pn=0407
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0430&pn=1322
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0430&pn=2274
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0430P1322.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=03/24/2021&RollCallId=225
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=158
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=172
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/21/2021&RollCallId=348
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=10/19/2021&RollCallId=572
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=15&theDate=10/19/2021&RollCallId=571

Bill Comments

feedback