PA HB430 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-24 - Referred to AGING AND YOUTH
Pending: Senate Aging & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for definitions; providing for advanced communication technologies and for regulations; further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse, for reporting procedure, for photographs, medical tests and X-rays of child subject to report, for establishment of Statewide toll-free telephone number, for continuous availability of Department of Public Welfare and for disposition of complaints received; providing for responsibility for investigation; and further providing for information in Statewide central register, for continuous availability to receive reports and for education and training.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for definitions; providing for advanced communication technologies and for regulations; further providing for persons required to report suspected child abuse, for reporting procedure, for photographs, medical tests and X-rays of child subject to report, for establishment of Statewide toll-free telephone number, for continuous availability of Department of Public Welfare and for disposition of complaints received; providing for responsibility for investigation; and further providing for information in Statewide central register, for continuous availability to receive reports and for education and training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - House - HB 430 PN 2007, FP (Y: 184 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-24 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2013-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (184-6) |
2013-06-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-06-19 | House | Second consideration |
2013-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-02-08 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |