PA HB429 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-01 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-01 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Title
In high schools, further providing for courses of study.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Floor: HB 429 PN 2608, FP (Y: 185 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 429 PN 2582, 2017 A4036, ROEBUCK (Y: 79 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 429 PN 2582, 2017 A4013, O'NEILL (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03842 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-24 - House - House Floor: HB 429 PN 2608, FP (Y: 185 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 429 PN 2582, 2017 A4036, ROEBUCK (Y: 79 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2017-10-18 - House - House Floor: HB 429 PN 2582, 2017 A4013, O'NEILL (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03842 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2017-10-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-1) |
2017-10-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-10-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-10-18 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2017-10-17 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-16 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |