PA HB425 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Act No. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of August 26, 1971 (P.L.351, No.91), known as the State Lottery Law, in pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pharmaceutical assistance for the elderly, further providing for determination of eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 425 PN 441, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 425 PN 441, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01088 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-21SenateAct No. 62
2017-12-21SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-12-11SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-12-11SenateSigned in Senate
2017-11-20SenateSigned in House
2017-11-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-14SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-11-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-11-13SenateSecond consideration
2017-10-25SenateFirst consideration
2017-10-25SenateReported as committed
2017-06-09SenateReferred to AGING AND YOUTH
2017-06-06SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2017-06-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as committed
2017-02-10HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=425
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0425&pn=0441
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=401
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=411
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/06/2017&RollCallId=517
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=1&theDate=10/25/2017&RollCallId=527
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=11/14/2017&RollCallId=551
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=345

Bill Comments

feedback