PA HB424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 29, 1953 (P.L.304, No.66), known as the Vital Statistics Law of 1953, in death and fetal death registration, further providing for information for certificates and for coroner referrals.
Title
In death and fetal death registration, further providing for information for certificates and for coroner referrals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 424 PN 440, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 424 PN 440, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 424 PN 440, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 17 |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2017-03-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-21 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to HEALTH |