PA HB414 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for an erosion and sediment control permit, for compliance, for an annual report and for duties of the Department of Environmental Protection.
Title
Providing for an erosion and sediment control permit, for compliance, for an annual report and for duties of the Department of Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A00745 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A00745 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |