PA HB409 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-25 - Act No. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for Uniform Construction Code Review and Advisory Council and providing for review of updated sections and adoption of updated sections into Uniform Construction Code; in Uniform Construction Code, further providing for revised or successor codes; further providing for changes in Uniform Construction Code; in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for education and training programs; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for applicability to certain buildings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for Uniform Construction Code Review and Advisory Council and providing for review of updated sections and adoption of updated sections into Uniform Construction Code; in Uniform Construction Code, further providing for revised or successor codes; further providing for changes in Uniform Construction Code; in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for education and training programs; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for applicability to certain buildings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-04 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 2155, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-10-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 409 PN 2155, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 1235, FP (Y: 110 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 1235, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 1235, FP (Y: 116 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 409 PN 1235, 2017 A1015, SUSP RULES, VITALI (Y: 69 N: 123 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00647 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A00633 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-25HouseAct No. 36
2017-10-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-10-17HousePresented to the Governor
2017-10-16HouseSigned in Senate
2017-10-04HouseSigned in House
2017-10-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (197-1)
2017-10-04HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-10-04HouseReferred to RULES
2017-10-04HouseIn the House
2017-10-04SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2017-09-20SenateRemoved from table
2017-09-20SenateLaid on the table
2017-07-08SenateRe-reported as committed
2017-06-27SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-27SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-26SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-26SenateReported as amended
2017-05-04SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-04-25SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-25HouseFinal passage (110-82)
2017-04-25HouseVote on final passage reconsidered (192-0)
2017-04-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-76)
2017-04-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-05HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-04HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-03HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-03HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-03HouseReported as amended
2017-02-08HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=409
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0409&pn=0416
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0409&pn=1235
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0409&pn=2155
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=04/03/2017&RollCallId=186
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=04/03/2017&RollCallId=188
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=04/03/2017&RollCallId=189
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/19/2017&RollCallId=263
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=268
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=269
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=273
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=274
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/26/2017&RollCallId=337
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=07/08/2017&RollCallId=407
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=282
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=737
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=10/04/2017&RollCallId=966

Bill Comments

feedback