PA HB407 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 1 (General Provisions) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of construction, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of construction, further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 407 PN 878, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor: HB 407 PN 878, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor: HB 407 PN 541, 2019 A97, HOHENSTEIN (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00057 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00062 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07SenateAct No. 79
2019-11-07SenateApproved by the Governor
2019-10-31SenatePresented to the Governor
2019-10-30SenateSigned in Senate
2019-10-30SenateSigned in House
2019-10-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2019-10-28SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-23SenateRemoved from table
2019-10-23SenateLaid on the table
2019-06-19SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-19SenateReported as committed
2019-03-19SenateReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
2019-03-13SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2019-03-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-03-11HouseRemoved from table
2019-02-19HouseLaid on the table
2019-02-19HouseFirst consideration
2019-02-19HouseReported as amended
2019-02-06HouseReferred to URBAN AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=407
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0407&pn=0382
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0407&pn=0541
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0407&pn=0878
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=30
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=29
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=40&theDate=02/19/2019&RollCallId=28
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=69
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=81
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/13/2019&RollCallId=112
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=35&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=371
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=309

Bill Comments

feedback