PA HB404 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-20 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in children and youth, providing for Statewide children's mental health ombudsman.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In children and youth, providing for Statewide children's mental health ombudsman.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-20HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-25HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-25HouseReported as committed
2021-02-04HouseReferred to HUMAN SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback