PA HB404 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in falsification and intimidation, providing for the offense of intimidation or retaliation in child abuse cases.
Title
In falsification and intimidation, providing for the offense of intimidation or retaliation in child abuse cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-12 - House - HB 404 PN 583, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2013-02-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-11 | House | Second consideration |
2013-02-07 | House | Removed from table |
2013-02-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-02-06 | House | First consideration |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |