PA HB398 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-24 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, further providing for verification of eligibility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In public assistance, further providing for verification of eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 398 PN 372, FP (Y: 113 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-24SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2022-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2022-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (113-90)
2022-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2022-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2022-04-27HouseRemoved from table
2022-04-26HouseLaid on the table
2022-04-26HouseFirst consideration
2022-04-26HouseReported as committed
2021-02-04HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback