PA HB396 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-5)
Status: Passed on July 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-07 - Act No. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for drug delivery resulting in death and for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.
Title
Further providing for drug delivery resulting in death and for sentences for second and subsequent offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-27 - Senate - HB 396 PN 1525, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - HB 396 PN 1525, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - HB 396 PN 1525, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-07 | Senate | Act No. 40 |
2011-07-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-05-03 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-04-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2011-04-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-04-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-26 | House | Second consideration |
2011-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-12 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-02-02 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |