PA HB373 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person.
Title
Further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - House - HB 373 PN 1792, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-06-03 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-12 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-06 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-03-30 | Re-committed to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES | |
2009-03-25 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-25 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-24 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-23 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-23 | First consideration | |
2009-03-23 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-10 | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |