PA HB364 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Passed on July 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-01 - Act No. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for enforcement of failure to stop for school bus with flashing red lights; and, in other required equipment, further providing for visual signals on authorized vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rules of the road in general, further providing for enforcement of failure to stop for school bus with flashing red lights; and, in other required equipment, further providing for visual signals on authorized vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 364 PN 4023, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 364 PN 4023, CONCUR (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 364 PN 1974, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 364 PN 1374, 2019 A1183, GABLER (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00723 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-01HouseAct No. 38
2020-07-01HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-06-29HousePresented to the Governor
2020-06-29HouseSigned in Senate
2020-06-24HouseSigned in House
2020-06-24HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
2020-06-24HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-06-24HouseReferred to RULES
2020-06-24HouseIn the House
2020-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-06-24SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-06-23SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-06-23SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-09SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-09SenateReported as amended
2019-06-06SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-04SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-06-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-10HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-10HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-10HouseReported as amended
2019-02-04HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=364
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0364&pn=0334
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0364&pn=1374
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0364&pn=1974
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0364&pn=3908
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0364&pn=4017
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0364&pn=4023
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=347
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/10/2019&RollCallId=348
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=334
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=353
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=608
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/09/2020&RollCallId=946
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/23/2020&RollCallId=1010
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1469
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=555
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=2300

Bill Comments 750

feedback