PA HB360 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-34)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Act No. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in marriage license, further providing for restrictions on issuance of license and for oral examination; and, in child protective services, providing for pandemic of 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In marriage license, further providing for restrictions on issuance of license and for oral examination; and, in child protective services, providing for pandemic of 2020.

Sponsors

Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Perry Warren [D]Rep. Tarah Toohil [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]
Rep. Ryan Bizzarro [D]Rep. Timothy Briggs [D]Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D]Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D]
Rep. Tina Davis [D]Rep. Michael Driscoll [D]Rep. Torren Ecker [R]Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]
Rep. Neal Goodman [D]Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D]Rep. Kristine Howard [D]
Rep. Rich Irvin [R]Rep. Mary Isaacson [D]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Stephen Kinsey [D]
Rep. Kate Klunk [R]Rep. Joanna McClinton [D]Rep. Jeanne McNeill [D]Rep. Daniel Miller [D]
Rep. Lori Mizgorski [R]Rep. Ed Neilson [D]Rep. Joseph Petrarca [D]Rep. Christopher Rabb [D]
Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Paul Schemel [R]Rep. Michael Schlossberg [D]Rep. Peter Schweyer [D]
Rep. Melissa Shusterman [D]Rep. Craig Staats [R]Rep. Wendy Ullman [D]Rep. Maria Donatucci [D]
Rep. Susan Helm [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. Tedd Nesbit [R]Rep. Adam Ravenstahl [D]
Rep. Jason Dawkins [D]Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. Christina Sappey [D]Rep. Steven Malagari [D]
Rep. Ryan Mackenzie [R]Rep. Natalie Mihalek [R]Rep. Scott Conklin [D]Rep. Dan Frankel [D]
Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Stephen Barrar [R]Rep. Mary Jo Daley [D]Rep. Michael Sturla [D]
Rep. Sara Innamorato [D]Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]Rep. Harry Readshaw [D]Rep. Eddie Pashinski [D]
Rep. Maureen Madden [D]Rep. Joseph Hohenstein [D]Rep. Robert Merski [D]Rep. Daryl Metcalfe [R]
Rep. Donald Cook [R]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]Rep. Ben Sanchez [D]
Rep. Brian Sims [D]Rep. Matthew Bradford [D]Rep. Carolyn Comitta [D]Rep. Jared Solomon [D]
Rep. Martin Flynn [D]Rep. Jordan Harris [D]Rep. Patty Kim [D]Rep. Isabella Fitzgerald [D]
Rep. Robert James [R]Rep. Gene DiGirolamo [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]
Rep. Brandon Markosek [D]Rep. David Maloney [R]Rep. Margo Davidson [D]Rep. Robert Brooks [R]
Rep. Movita Johnson-Harrell [D]Rep. Mark Rozzi [D]Rep. Wendi Thomas [R]Rep. Liz Hanbidge [D]
Rep. Joseph Webster [D]Rep. Cris Dush [R]

Roll Calls

2020-04-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - House - House Floor: HB 360 PN 3660, CONCUR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 360 PN 3660, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 360 PN 331, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseAct No. 18
2020-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-05-06HousePresented to the Governor
2020-05-06HouseSigned in Senate
2020-04-29HouseSigned in House
2020-04-29HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (202-0)
2020-04-29HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-04-29HouseReferred to RULES
2020-04-29HouseIn the House
2020-04-29SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-04-29SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-04-28SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-04-21SenateSecond consideration
2020-04-20SenateFirst consideration
2020-04-20SenateReported as amended
2019-06-06SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-03HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as committed
2019-02-04HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=360
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0360&pn=0331
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0360&pn=3583
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0360&pn=3657
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0360&pn=3660
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=540
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=366
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=638
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=04/20/2020&RollCallId=792
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=444
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1236
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=04/29/2020&RollCallId=1866

Bill Comments

feedback