PA HB360 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in employees, further providing for commission members.
Title
In employees, further providing for commission members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 360 PN 378, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2017-04-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-04 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-03 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-22 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |