PA HB359 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for exemption from taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In emergency finance and tax provisions, providing for exemption from taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2022-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-10-27HouseRemoved from table
2021-10-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-23HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-23HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-03HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-03HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-02-04HouseLaid on the table
2021-02-04HouseFirst consideration
2021-02-04HouseReported as committed
2021-02-03HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback