PA HB359 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-7)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 37-7)
Status: Passed on October 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-14 - Act No. 141
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 19, 1990 (P.L.1200, No.202), known as the Solicitation of Funds for Charitable Purposes Act, further providing for registration of charitable organizations, financial reports, fees and failure to file.
Title
Further providing for registration of charitable organizations, financial reports, fees and failure to file.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-14 | Senate | Act No. 141 |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2014-03-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-03-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-03-10 | House | Second consideration |
2014-02-10 | House | Removed from table |
2014-02-04 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-02-04 | House | First consideration |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |