PA HB358 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for a volunteer health care practitioner certification; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for a volunteer health care practitioner certification; and imposing powers and duties on the Department of Health.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-21HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-13HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-13HouseReported as committed
2017-02-07HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback