PA HB357 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, providing for transfer of attendance records to another school entity or nonpublic school; in charter schools, further providing for definitions, for establishment of charter school, for contents of application and for term and form of charter, providing for amendments and further providing for enrollment, for cyber charter school requirements and prohibitions, for tort liability and for establishment of cyber charter school.
Title
In pupils and attendance, providing for transfer of attendance records to another school entity or nonpublic school; in charter schools, further providing for definitions, for establishment of charter school, for contents of application and for term and form of charter, providing for amendments and further providing for enrollment, for cyber charter school requirements and prohibitions, for tort liability and for establishment of cyber charter school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 2108, FP (Y: 106 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1790, ISAACSON (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1781, D. MILLER (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1765, CARROLL (Y: 99 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1759, SAMUELSON (Y: 93 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1383, CIRESI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1382, CIRESI (Y: 94 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1381, CIRESI (Y: 95 N: 103 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1284, MERSKI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1283, HILL-EVANS (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1809, TOPPER (Y: 183 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 2108, FP (Y: 106 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1790, ISAACSON (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1781, D. MILLER (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1765, CARROLL (Y: 99 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1759, SAMUELSON (Y: 93 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1383, CIRESI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1382, CIRESI (Y: 94 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1381, CIRESI (Y: 95 N: 103 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1284, MERSKI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1283, HILL-EVANS (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1809, TOPPER (Y: 183 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (106-91) |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |