PA HB357 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, providing for transfer of attendance records to another school entity or nonpublic school; in charter schools, further providing for definitions, for establishment of charter school, for contents of application and for term and form of charter, providing for amendments and further providing for enrollment, for cyber charter school requirements and prohibitions, for tort liability and for establishment of cyber charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pupils and attendance, providing for transfer of attendance records to another school entity or nonpublic school; in charter schools, further providing for definitions, for establishment of charter school, for contents of application and for term and form of charter, providing for amendments and further providing for enrollment, for cyber charter school requirements and prohibitions, for tort liability and for establishment of cyber charter school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 2108, FP (Y: 106 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1790, ISAACSON (Y: 91 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1781, D. MILLER (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1765, CARROLL (Y: 99 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1759, SAMUELSON (Y: 93 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1383, CIRESI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1382, CIRESI (Y: 94 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1381, CIRESI (Y: 95 N: 103 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1284, MERSKI (Y: 92 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1283, HILL-EVANS (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 357 PN 1746, 2019 A1809, TOPPER (Y: 183 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-06-12SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (106-91)
2019-06-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-11HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-13HouseReported as committed
2019-05-07HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=357
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0357&pn=1746
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0357&pn=2108
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=493
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=398
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=401
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=402
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=403
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=404
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=405
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=427
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/12/2019&RollCallId=766

Bill Comments

feedback