PA HB347 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-12 - Signed in House
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-11-12 - Signed in House
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in registration of vehicles, further providing for issuance and reissuance of registration plates and for lost, stolen, damaged or illegible registration plate; in licensing of drivers, further providing for issuance and content of driver's license; in commercial drivers, further providing for definitions for requirement for commercial driver's license, for commercial driver's license qualification standards and for disqualification; in fees, further providing for exemptions from other fees; in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices; in inspection of vehicles, further providing for inspection by police or Commonwealth personnel; in size, weight and load, further providing for securing loads in vehicles, for height of vehicles and for permit for movement during course of manufacture; in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for promulgation of rules and regulations by department; and in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for definitions.
Title
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in registration of vehicles, further providing for issuance and reissuance of registration plates and for lost, stolen, damaged or illegible registration plate; in licensing of drivers, further providing for issuance and content of driver's license; in commercial drivers, further providing for definitions for requirement for commercial driver's license, for commercial driver's license qualification standards and for disqualification; in fees, further providing for exemptions from other fees; in rules of the road in general, further providing for speed timing devices; in inspection of vehicles, further providing for inspection by police or Commonwealth personnel; in size, weight and load, further providing for securing loads in vehicles, for height of vehicles and for permit for movement during course of manufacture; in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for promulgation of rules and regulations by department; and in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-11-12 | Signed in House | |
2008-11-12 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2008-11-12 | Reported as committed | |
2008-10-08 | Referred to RULES | |
2008-10-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-10-06 | Re-reported as amended | |
2008-09-24 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-09-24 | Second consideration | |
2008-09-23 | First consideration | |
2008-09-23 | Reported as amended | |
2007-04-30 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2007-04-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-04-25 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-04-23 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-04-23 | Second consideration | |
2007-04-18 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-17 | First consideration | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as amended | |
2007-02-09 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=347 |