PA HB324 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 30, 1984 (P.L.345, No.69), known as the First Class City Business Tax Reform Act, further providing for definitions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-13 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Floor: HB 324 PN 298, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-05-23SenateSecond consideration
2022-04-13SenateFirst consideration
2022-04-13SenateReported as committed
2022-01-25SenateReferred to FINANCE
2022-01-25SenateIn the Senate
2022-01-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (200-0)
2022-01-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2022-01-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2022-01-24HouseSecond consideration
2022-01-12HouseRemoved from table
2022-01-11HouseLaid on the table
2022-01-11HouseFirst consideration
2022-01-11HouseReported as committed
2021-01-28HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=324
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0324&pn=0298
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0324P0298.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=01/11/2022&RollCallId=1211
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=725
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/25/2022&RollCallId=1280
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=25&theDate=04/13/2022&RollCallId=941

Bill Comments

feedback