PA HB303 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-05 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1005, known as Church View Road, Segment 0180, Offset 0000, over Beaver Creek, South Woodbury Township, Bedford County, as the PFC/POW William G. Koontz Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of State Route 1005, known as Church View Road, Segment 0180, Offset 0000, over Beaver Creek, South Woodbury Township, Bedford County, as the PFC/POW William G. Koontz Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 303 PN 303, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 303 PN 303, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2017-05-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2017-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2017-04-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-05 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-04 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-22 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |