PA HB298 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in training and certification of inspectors, further providing for training of inspectors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In training and certification of inspectors, further providing for training of inspectors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 298 PN 292, FP (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01SenateLaid on the table
2018-06-21SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-21SenateReported as amended
2017-03-24SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2017-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-1)
2017-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-03-13HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-03-13HouseSecond consideration
2017-02-08HouseRemoved from table
2017-02-06HouseLaid on the table
2017-02-06HouseFirst consideration
2017-02-06HouseReported as committed
2017-02-02HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=298
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0298&pn=0292
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0298&pn=3796
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=02/06/2017&RollCallId=27
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=86
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/20/2017&RollCallId=100
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/21/2018&RollCallId=1030

Bill Comments

feedback