PA HB285 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-17 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) and 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in judicial boards and commissions, further providing for powers and duties, for adoption of guidelines for sentencing, for adoption of guidelines for county intermediate punishment, for adoption of guidelines for State intermediate punishment and for adoption of risk assessment instrument; in sentencing, further providing for sentencing generally, for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties, for order of probation, for sentence of partial confinement, for sentence of total confinement, for sentence of county intermediate punishment, for information required upon commitment and subsequent disposition, for modification or revocation of order of probation, for court-imposed sanctions for offenders violating probation, for modification or revocation of county intermediate punishment sentence and for revocation of State intermediate punishment sentence; in county intermediate punishment, further providing for county intermediate punishment programs and for continued eligibility; in motivational boot camp, further providing for definitions, for selection of inmate participants and for motivational boot camp program; in State intermediate punishment, further providing scope of chapter, for definitions, for referral to State intermediate punishment program, for drug offender treatment program and for reports; in recidivism risk reduction incentive, further providing for definitions, for evaluation and for reports; in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for definitions, for advisory committee, for general powers of board, for probation services, for parole power, providing for short sentence parole, further providing for violation of terms of parole and for parole procedure; and making conforming amendments.
Title
In judicial boards and commissions, further providing for powers and duties, for adoption of guidelines for sentencing, for adoption of guidelines for county intermediate punishment, for adoption of guidelines for State intermediate punishment and for adoption of risk assessment instrument; in sentencing, further providing for sentencing generally, for collection of restitution, reparation, fees, costs, fines and penalties, for order of probation, for sentence of partial confinement, for sentence of total confinement, for sentence of county intermediate punishment, for information required upon commitment and subsequent disposition, for modification or revocation of order of probation, for court-imposed sanctions for offenders violating probation, for modification or revocation of county intermediate punishment sentence and for revocation of State intermediate punishment sentence; in county intermediate punishment, further providing for county intermediate punishment programs and for continued eligibility; in motivational boot camp, further providing for definitions, for selection of inmate participants and for motivational boot camp program; in State intermediate punishment, further providing scope of chapter, for definitions, for referral to State intermediate punishment program, for drug offender treatment program and for reports; in recidivism risk reduction incentive, further providing for definitions, for evaluation and for reports; in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for definitions, for advisory committee, for general powers of board, for probation services, for parole power, providing for short sentence parole, further providing for violation of terms of parole and for parole procedure; and making conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 285 PN 4272, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 285 PN 2197, A2893, MARTIN AMENDMENT NO. A-2893 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 285 PN 271, FP (Y: 144 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 285 PN 2197, A2893, MARTIN AMENDMENT NO. A-2893 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 285 PN 271, FP (Y: 144 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-17 | House | Referred to RULES |
2018-10-17 | House | In the House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-1) |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-10-16 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-06-20 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-10-02 | Senate | Removed from table |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2017-07-09 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (48-1) |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-07-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-30 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2017-03-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (144-51) |
2017-03-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-03-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-13 | House | Second consideration |
2017-02-08 | House | Removed from table |
2017-02-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-02-07 | House | First consideration |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-02-01 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |