PA HB284 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 37 (Historical and Museums) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties of Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission, further providing for specific powers and duties, for personal property and for documents and providing for Commonwealth archival records, for local government archival records and for access to older public records; and, in historic properties, further providing for title to historic property and for powers over certain historic property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in powers and duties of Pennsylvania Historical and Museum Commission, further providing for specific powers and duties, for personal property and for documents and providing for Commonwealth archival records, for local government archival records and for access to older public records; and, in historic properties, further providing for title to historic property and for powers over certain historic property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 284 PN 282, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00177 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-17SenateReported as committed
2021-02-11SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-28HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as amended
2021-01-25HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=284
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0284&pn=0219
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0284&pn=0282
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0284&pn=0219&aYear=2021&an=00177
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0284P0282.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=44
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=45
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=30
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=101
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=52

Bill Comments

feedback