PA HB2788 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-8)
Status: Engrossed on September 2 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in pupils and attendance, providing for extended special education enrollment due to COVID-19; and, in terms and courses of study, providing for option year of education due to COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In pupils and attendance, providing for extended special education enrollment due to COVID-19; and, in terms and courses of study, providing for option year of education due to COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A06960 (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - House - House Floor: HB 2788 PN 4333, FP (Y: 197 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2788 PN 4303, 2019 A6843, MULLERY (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Floor: HB 2788 PN 4303, 2019 A6848, TOPPER (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-01 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A06782 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-18SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2020-09-02SenateIn the Senate
2020-09-02HouseThird consideration and final passage (197-5)
2020-09-02HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-09-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-09-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2020-09-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-08-28HouseRe-committed to RULES
2020-08-28HouseFirst consideration
2020-08-28HouseReported as amended
2020-08-18HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2788
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2788&pn=4259
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2788&pn=4303
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2788&pn=4333
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=08/20/2020&RollCallId=2391
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=08/20/2020&RollCallId=2392
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=09/01/2020&RollCallId=2397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1542
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1543
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1574
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/02/2020&RollCallId=2434
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/02/2020&RollCallId=2435

Bill Comments

feedback