PA HB278 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 78-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-03 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 78-2)
Status: Passed on November 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-11-03 - Act No. 84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.103, No.69), known as The Second Class Township Code, in contracts, further providing for competitive bidding of contracts.
Title
In contracts, further providing for competitive bidding of contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-10-26 - House - HB 278 PN 2419, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-10-24 - Senate - HB 278 PN 2419, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - HB 278 PN 1426, FP (Y: 118 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 278 PN 1426, 2011 A1315, HARHAI (Y: 90 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 278 PN 1426, 2011 A1290, SANTARSIERO (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-10-24 - Senate - HB 278 PN 2419, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-17 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - HB 278 PN 1426, FP (Y: 118 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 278 PN 1426, 2011 A1315, HARHAI (Y: 90 N: 110 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - House - HB 278 PN 1426, 2011 A1290, SANTARSIERO (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-03 | House | Act No. 84 |
2011-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2011-10-31 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2011-10-31 | House | Signed in Senate |
2011-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2011-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-1) |
2011-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2011-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2011-10-24 | House | In the House |
2011-10-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-10-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-04-25 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-04-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-04-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (118-80) |
2011-04-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-04-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-04-12 | House | Second consideration |
2011-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-05 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-01-27 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |