PA HB271 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on October 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-30 - Act No. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An act amending Titles 3 (Agriculture) and 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, extensively revising gaming provisions as follows: in Title 3: for horse racing, in the area of race horse industry reform. In Title 4: for amusements generally, in the areas of fantasy contests, of lottery and of iLottery; for gaming, in the areas of general provisions, of Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, of licensees, of table games, of interactive gaming, of revenues, of administration and enforcement and of miscellaneous provisions; and providing for video gaming. Providing, as to the revisions: for related repeals. Repealing a provision related to keno in the State Lottery Law.
Title
An act amending Titles 3 (Agriculture) and 4 (Amusements) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, extensively revising gaming provisions as follows: in Title 3: for horse racing, in the area of race horse industry reform. In Title 4: for amusements generally, in the areas of fantasy contests, of lottery and of iLottery; for gaming, in the areas of general provisions, of Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board, of licensees, of table games, of interactive gaming, of revenues, of administration and enforcement and of miscellaneous provisions; and providing for video gaming. Providing, as to the revisions: for related repeals. Repealing a provision related to keno in the State Lottery Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Ortitay [R] | Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. George Dunbar [R] | Rep. Harold English [R] |
Rep. William Kortz [D] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] | Rep. Eric Nelson [R] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, CONCUR (Y: 109 N: 72 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, MOT POSTPONE, STURLA (Y: 52 N: 129 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, MOT RECOM GAMING, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 55 N: 128 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, MOT POSTPONE, SAMUELSON (Y: 91 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A01698 (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1942, CONCUR (Y: 102 N: 89 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1942, PETRI, MOT RECOM GAMING OVERSIGHT (Y: 78 N: 114 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1942, MOT POSTPONE, VITALI (Y: 62 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 271 PN 1839, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1237, FP (Y: 142 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00654 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1028, 2017 A490, KAUFER (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00460 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, MOT POSTPONE, STURLA (Y: 52 N: 129 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, MOT RECOM GAMING, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 55 N: 128 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2017-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, MOT POSTPONE, SAMUELSON (Y: 91 N: 92 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 271 PN 2652, CONCURRENCE IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS AS AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A01698 (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1942, CONCUR (Y: 102 N: 89 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1942, PETRI, MOT RECOM GAMING OVERSIGHT (Y: 78 N: 114 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1942, MOT POSTPONE, VITALI (Y: 62 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 271 PN 1839, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 38 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1237, FP (Y: 142 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A00654 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Floor: HB 271 PN 1028, 2017 A490, KAUFER (Y: 79 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-03-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Gaming Oversight: Adopt Amendment A00460 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-30 | House | Act No. 42 |
2017-10-30 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2017-10-26 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2017-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2017-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2017-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as amended by the Senate (109-72) |
2017-10-25 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2017-10-25 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-10-25 | House | In the House |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (31-19) |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2017-06-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-06-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (102-89) |
2017-06-07 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended |
2017-06-07 | House | Amended in House Committee on RULES |
2017-06-05 | House | Referred to RULES |
2017-05-24 | House | In the House |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (38-12) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-committed to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-04-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2017-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (142-56) |
2017-04-03 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2017-03-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-03-22 | House | Second consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Removed from table |
2017-03-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-03-20 | House | First consideration |
2017-03-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to GAMING OVERSIGHT |