PA HB269 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 16 (Counties) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, consolidating the act of April 8, 1868 (P.L.73, No.37), entitled "An act to authorize the recorder of deeds in the several counties of this Commonwealth to record the discharges of all honorably discharged officers and soldiers"; and making a repeal.
Title
Consolidating the act of April 8, 1868 (P.L.73, No.37), entitled "An act to authorize the recorder of deeds in the several counties of this Commonwealth to record the discharges of all honorably discharged officers and soldiers"; and making a repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-12-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02640 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 269 PN 1300, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00556 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A02640 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-24 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 269 PN 1300, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00556 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2023-10-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2023-10-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2023-06-19 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2023-06-12 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-12 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-06-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-06 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |