PA HB2648 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 141 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 18-1)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 141 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Office of State Inspector General, further providing for powers, purpose and duties; repealing provisions relating to coordination of Commonwealth community service programs; providing for PennSERVE and for public works employment verification; establishing the Public Works Employment Verification Account; and making a related repeal.
Title
In Office of State Inspector General, further providing for powers, purpose and duties; repealing provisions relating to coordination of Commonwealth community service programs; providing for PennSERVE and for public works employment verification; establishing the Public Works Employment Verification Account; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2648 PN 3591, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2648 PN 3591, CONCURRENCE (Y: 170 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A05801 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A05813 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2648 PN 3201, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2648 PN 3591, Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2648 PN 3591, CONCURRENCE (Y: 170 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A05801 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A05813 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-24 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2648 PN 3201, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 141 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (170-28) |
2022-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-26 | House | In the House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (41-8) |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-10-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2022-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2022-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2022-06-08 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |