PA HB264 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 33 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 33 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 7, 1947 (P.L.1368, No.542), known as the Real Estate Tax Sale Law, adding provisions relating to bidder registration before sale; and, in sale of property, further providing for date of sale, for repurchase by owner, for restrictions on purchases and for sale of property in repository.
Title
Adding provisions relating to bidder registration before sale; and, in sale of property, further providing for date of sale, for repurchase by owner, for restrictions on purchases and for sale of property in repository.
Sponsors
Rep. Doyle Heffley [R] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. James Struzzi [R] | Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] |
Rep. Lori Mizgorski [R] | Rep. Gary Day [R] | Rep. Craig Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 264 PN 1003, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 264 PN 1003, FP (Y: 185 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended A00379 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00379 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Floor: HB 264 PN 1003, FP (Y: 185 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended A00379 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A00379 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Act No. 33 of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-1) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2021-04-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-04-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (185-16) |
2021-04-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-24 | House | Second consideration |
2021-03-23 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-22 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-22 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |