PA HB2633 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 139 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 139 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 5 (Athletics and Sports) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, extensively revising the Uniform Athlete Agents Act; providing for intercollegiate athletics; making related and inconsistent repeals; and making an editorial change.
Title
Extensively revising the Uniform Athlete Agents Act; providing for intercollegiate athletics; making related and inconsistent repeals; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2633 PN 3593, CONCURRENCE (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2633 PN 3593, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A05712 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2633 PN 3243, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2633 PN 3197, 2021 A4599 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04441 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2633 PN 3593, CONCURRENCE (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2633 PN 3593, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Adopt Amendment A05712 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-18 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 2633 PN 3243, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 2633 PN 3197, 2021 A4599 (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04441 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | House | Act No. 139 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (199-0) |
2022-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-10-25 | House | In the House |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-10-24 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3593 |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2022-06-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2022-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported as amended |
2022-05-31 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |