PA HB2630 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-28 - Re-referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
Pending: House Children & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-28 - Re-referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH
Pending: House Children & Youth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for child care payments during the pandemic of 2020.
Title
In public assistance, providing for child care payments during the pandemic of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-28 - House - House Human Services: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-28 | House | Re-referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2020-08-28 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |
2020-06-29 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |