PA HB262 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-14 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-14 - Act No. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act regulating prescribed burning practices; providing for the powers and duties of the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources and the Department of Environmental Protection; and establishing certain immunities.
Title
Regulating prescribed burning practices; providing for the powers and duties of the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources and the Department of Environmental Protection; and establishing certain immunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-13 - House - HB 262 PN 1776, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - HB 262 PN 1776, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - HB 262 PN 282, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-07 - Senate - HB 262 PN 1776, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - House - HB 262 PN 282, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-14 | Act No. 17 | |
2009-07-14 | Approved by the Governor | |
2009-07-14 | Presented to the Governor | |
2009-07-14 | Signed in Senate | |
2009-07-13 | Signed in House | |
2009-07-13 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2009-07-09 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-08 | Referred to RULES | |
2009-07-07 | In the House | |
2009-07-07 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-06 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-17 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-05 | First consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-02 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2009-03-31 | In the Senate | |
2009-03-31 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-03-30 | Second consideration | |
2009-03-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-25 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-25 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-24 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-24 | First consideration | |
2009-03-24 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-05 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |